|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 08/11/1922 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 27/03/1925 | 30/07/1925 | 126 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/06/1927 | 10/11/1927 | 143 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/12/1929 | 10/02/1930 | 54 days | General | Boiler number HL983 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/04/1930 | 26/04/1930 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/11/1930 | 02/12/1930 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1933 | 01/12/1933 | 38 days | General | Boiler number E4/2 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1937 | 29/06/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number HL104 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1942 | 14/03/1942 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1965 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1944 | 06/04/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/07/1945 | 02/08/1945 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3420 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1948 | 03/12/1948 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63420 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1951 | 10/03/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24178 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1951 | 14/03/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24248 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1953 | 11/03/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1955 | 26/05/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1956 | 14/11/1956 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1956 | 28/11/1956 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1957 | 21/08/1957 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1958 | 20/06/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24288 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1959 | 23/12/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1962 | 04/04/1962 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 24217 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1965 | 03/06/1965 | 28 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 24240 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2263 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 11 Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: 08/11/1922. | ||
14/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
03/05/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
27/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1925. Dep: 30/07/1925. | ||
21/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1927. Dep: 10/11/1927. | ||
19/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1929. Dep: 10/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL983 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930. | ||
10/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1930. Dep: 02/12/1930. | ||
25/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1933. Dep: 01/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/2 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1937. Dep: 29/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL104 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1965 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
13/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1944. Dep: 06/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1945. Dep: 02/08/1945. | ||
12/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3420 |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
15/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1948. Dep: 03/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63420 |
||
13/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24178 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1951. Dep: 14/03/1951. | ||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24248 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1953. Dep: 11/03/1953. | ||
19/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. | ||
21/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1955. Dep: 26/05/1955. | ||
28/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956. | ||
20/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1956. Dep: 28/11/1956. | ||
15/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1957. Dep: 21/08/1957. | ||
06/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24288 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
16/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1959. Dep: 23/12/1959. | ||
24/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1962. Dep: 04/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24217 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
07/05/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1965. Dep: 03/06/1965. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24240 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (55E) | ||
02/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
05/02/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63420 from Tyne Dock (52H) |