|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 15/03/1923 | 22/05/1923 | 69 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1926 | 09/07/1926 | 135 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/05/1928 | 26/07/1928 | 63 days | General | Boiler number D855 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1929 | 23/09/1929 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1930 | 07/04/1930 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1930 | 29/09/1930 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 20 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1933 | 13/09/1933 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1935 | 03/10/1935 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1938 | 22/12/1938 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 2989 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1940 | 05/04/1940 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1940 | 24/09/1940 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1941 | 09/05/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1943 | 19/06/1943 | 44 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/03/1945 | 12/04/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3148 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/03/1948 | 26/03/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1949 | 02/08/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63422 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24226 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1952 | 20/08/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1955 | 16/12/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24238 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1956 | 29/03/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1959 | 22/04/1959 | 22 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2265 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 13 Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1923. Dep: 22/05/1923. | ||
08/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
19/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
25/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1926. Dep: 09/07/1926. | ||
25/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1928. Dep: 26/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D855 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1929. Dep: 23/09/1929. | ||
28/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/02/1930. Dep: 07/04/1930. | ||
09/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
05/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1930. Dep: 29/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 20 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1933. Dep: 13/09/1933. | ||
22/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1935. Dep: 03/10/1935. | ||
20/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1938. Dep: 22/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2989 (Diagram 50A) |
||
21/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1940. Dep: 05/04/1940. | ||
25/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1940. Dep: 24/09/1940. | ||
08/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1941. Dep: 09/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943. | ||
11/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
27/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1945. Dep: 12/04/1945. | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3422 | ||
31/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3148 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
07/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
10/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1948. Dep: 26/03/1948. | ||
23/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1949. Dep: 02/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63422 |
||
10/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24226 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1952. Dep: 20/08/1952. | ||
22/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1955. Dep: 16/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24238 (Diagram 50A) |
||
22/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1956. Dep: 29/03/1956. | ||
26/03/1959 | Modification | Diagram 50A number 24184 boiler fitted | ||
01/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1959. Dep: 22/04/1959. | ||
18/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63422 from West Hartlepool (51C) |