|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 09/02/1923 | 18/04/1923 | 69 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/10/1925 | 30/12/1925 | 84 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/12/1927 | 01/03/1928 | 79 days | General | Boiler number D234 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 31/07/1929 | 20/08/1929 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/02/1932 | 30/03/1932 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1935 | 17/12/1935 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 2259 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1938 | 30/09/1938 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1938 | 07/10/1938 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1941 | 26/04/1941 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/08/1945 | 30/08/1945 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2569 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3423 |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/11/1947 | 17/11/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1948 | 30/12/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3851 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63423 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1949 | 15/01/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24190 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/02/1952 | 24/03/1952 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1953 | 31/12/1953 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1954 | 22/01/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/06/1955 | 21/09/1955 | 90 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1956 | 18/09/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24273 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1956 | 09/10/1956 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1960 | 21/09/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1961 | 09/11/1961 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1962 | 29/08/1962 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 24300 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1964 | 10/11/1964 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2266 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 14 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1923. Dep: 18/04/1923. | ||
08/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1925. Dep: 30/12/1925. | ||
14/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1927. Dep: 01/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D234 (Diagram 50) |
||
31/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1929. Dep: 20/08/1929. | ||
26/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1932. Dep: 30/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1935. Dep: 17/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2259 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1938. Dep: 30/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/09/1938. Dep: 07/10/1938. | ||
18/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
17/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1945. Dep: 30/08/1945. | ||
22/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2569 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3423 |
||
02/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/11/1947. Dep: 17/11/1947. | ||
09/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1948. Dep: 30/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3851 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63423 |
||
06/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 15/01/1949. | ||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
24/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
12/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24190 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/02/1952. Dep: 24/03/1952. | ||
03/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/12/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953. | ||
13/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1954. Dep: 22/01/1954. | ||
24/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1955. Dep: 21/09/1955. | ||
16/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1956. Dep: 18/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24273 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1956. Dep: 09/10/1956. | ||
28/11/1958 | Modification | Diagram 50A number 24284 boiler fitted | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1960. Dep: 21/09/1960. | ||
09/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/11/1961. Dep: 09/11/1961. | ||
06/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1962. Dep: 29/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24300 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/08/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
10/11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 10/11/1964. Dep: 10/11/1964. | ||
16/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63423 from Sunderland (52G) |