|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 13/12/1922 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 25/05/1925 | 25/08/1925 | 93 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/07/1928 | 24/08/1928 | 54 days | General | Boiler number E4/13 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 31/12/1930 | 03/02/1931 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/07/1932 | 04/08/1932 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D930 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1937 | 29/07/1937 | 59 days | General | Boiler number HL106 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/07/1940 | 21/08/1940 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1943 | 29/05/1943 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/08/1945 | 17/09/1945 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1946 | 27/04/1946 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3425 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1946 | 22/02/1947 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 2826 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1949 | 06/12/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2992 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63425 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 24220 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1952 | 13/05/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1953 | 23/09/1953 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1954 | 30/09/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24217 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1957 | 01/02/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24168 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1957 | 22/02/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1959 | 18/11/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24271 (Diagram 50A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2268 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 16 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: 13/12/1922. | ||
12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
25/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1925. Dep: 25/08/1925. | ||
02/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1928. Dep: 24/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/13 (Diagram 50) |
||
31/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1930. Dep: 03/02/1931. | ||
06/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1932. Dep: 04/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D930 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1937. Dep: 29/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL106 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
23/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1940. Dep: 21/08/1940. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
16/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1945. Dep: 17/09/1945. | ||
05/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3425 |
||
27/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 22/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2826 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
12/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
10/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1949. Dep: 06/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2992 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63425 |
||
24/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
15/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24220 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1952. Dep: 13/05/1952. | ||
08/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1953. Dep: 23/09/1953. | ||
03/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1954. Dep: 30/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24217 (Diagram 50A) |
||
08/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1957. Dep: 01/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24168 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/02/1957. Dep: 22/02/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
19/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1959. Dep: 18/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24271 (Diagram 50A) |
||
15/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63425 from Tyne Dock (52H) |