Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 110 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4070 Week
» 33656 Month
» 407669 Year
» 1629234 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2280 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3437   07/06/1946
British Railways 63437 w/e 06/01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q606/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number E4
Works Number 28
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 06/1920 to Neville Hill (NEV)
Withdrawal Mon 05/06/1967 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 47 yrs , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth, 8/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEV Neville Hill (New) m/e 06/1920
SBK Starbeck on 06/05/1931
NEV Neville Hill on 28/03/1943
SKN Stockton on 23/06/1943
BLA Blaydon on 05/10/1947
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/09/1949
TDK Tyne Dock on 01/12/1949
52K Consett on 13/12/1959
52C Blaydon on 11/09/1960
52G Sunderland on 16/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 05/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 54D Consett 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   on 05/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1920 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/28)
16/05/1929 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/47)
27/10/1942 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3310)
03/03/1945 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3298)
13/03/1954 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24160)
09/05/1958 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24283)
14/06/1962 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24299)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 18/05/1923 25/07/1923 69 days General  
Darlington Works 28/12/1925 16/04/1926 110 days General  
Darlington Works 26/03/1929 16/05/1929 52 days General
Boiler number E4/47 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 12/09/1932 19/10/1932 38 days General
Boiler number 37 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 29/03/1934 12/07/1934 106 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 12/03/1935 09/04/1935 29 days General  
Darlington Works 21/05/1937 19/08/1937 91 days General  
Darlington Works 27/12/1939 29/01/1940 34 days General  
Darlington Works 22/03/1941 07/05/1941 47 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/09/1942 27/10/1942 41 days General
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 16/03/1944 27/04/1944 43 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 31/01/1945 03/03/1945 32 days General
Boiler number 24222 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 23/08/1945 22/09/1945 31 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 24/09/1945 02/10/1945 9 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 26/05/1946 07/06/1946 13 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3437
 
Darlington Works 12/08/1946 21/08/1946 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/08/1947 27/09/1947 39 days General
Boiler number 24171 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 28/11/1950 06/01/1951 40 days General
Renumbered to BR 63437
 
Darlington Works 16/02/1954 13/03/1954 26 days General
Boiler number 24160 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 22/03/1954 26/03/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 31/07/1957 18/09/1957 50 days Light Casual  
Gateshead Works 08/04/1958 09/05/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 24283 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 14/05/1962 14/06/1962 32 days General
Boiler number 24299 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 05/03/1964 05/03/1964 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 28/04/1964 30/04/1964 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/06/1964 25/06/1964 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 21/10/1964 23/10/1964 3 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1954 Darlington Works North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. SLS/195404
03/12/1966 Allocation of Q6 class (Sunderland) Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2280
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 28
Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
18/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1923. Dep: 25/07/1923.    
28/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1925. Dep: 16/04/1926.    
26/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1929. Dep: 16/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number E4/47 (Diagram 50)
   
06/05/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK)    
12/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1932. Dep: 19/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 37 (Diagram 50)
   
29/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/03/1934. Dep: 12/07/1934.    
12/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1935. Dep: 09/04/1935.    
21/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1937. Dep: 19/08/1937.    
27/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1939. Dep: 29/01/1940.    
22/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1941. Dep: 07/05/1941.    
17/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1942. Dep: 27/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 50A)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
23/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
16/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1944. Dep: 27/04/1944.    
31/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24222 (Diagram 50A)
   
23/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945.    
24/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1945. Dep: 02/10/1945.    
26/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3437
   
12/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1946. Dep: 21/08/1946.    
20/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24171 (Diagram 50)
   
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
04/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
01/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
28/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1950. Dep: 06/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63437
   
16/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24160 (Diagram 50A)
   
22/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954.    
31/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1957. Dep: 18/09/1957.    
08/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1958. Dep: 09/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24283 (Diagram 50A)
   
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (52K)    
11/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
14/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1962. Dep: 14/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24299 (Diagram 50A)
   
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
05/03/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/03/1964. Dep: 05/03/1964.    
28/04/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1964. Dep: 30/04/1964.    
25/06/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/06/1964. Dep: 25/06/1964.    
21/10/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1964. Dep: 23/10/1964.    
05/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 63437 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev