|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 14/12/1922 | Unknown Regime | ||||
Gateshead Works | 13/03/1925 | 31/03/1925 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/11/1925 | 14/01/1926 | 72 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/10/1928 | 23/11/1928 | 40 days | General | Boiler number E4/36 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/05/1931 | 20/05/1931 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/06/1931 | 28/08/1931 | 72 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1933 | 06/09/1933 | 35 days | General | Boiler number D957 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1937 | 10/11/1937 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3143 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1940 | 16/08/1940 | 40 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1943 | 01/03/1943 | 38 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/04/1945 | 24/04/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3157 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1948 | 26/11/1948 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63438 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1948 | 08/12/1948 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1951 | 10/01/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24212 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1954 | 15/01/1955 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1957 | 31/08/1957 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24281 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1957 | 03/09/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1957 | 19/09/1957 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1960 | 26/01/1961 | 52 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1962 | 26/02/1962 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2281 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 29 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: 14/12/1922. | ||
01/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
13/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1925. Dep: 31/03/1925. | ||
04/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1925. Dep: 14/01/1926. | ||
15/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1928. Dep: 23/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/36 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1931. Dep: 20/05/1931. | ||
18/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/06/1931. Dep: 28/08/1931. | ||
03/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1933. Dep: 06/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D957 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1937. Dep: 10/11/1937. | ||
06/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3143 (Diagram 50A) |
||
08/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1940. Dep: 16/08/1940. | ||
14/06/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
23/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1943. Dep: 01/03/1943. | ||
04/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. | ||
23/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
09/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1945. Dep: 24/04/1945. | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3438 | ||
08/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3157 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1948. Dep: 26/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63438 |
||
30/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1948. Dep: 08/12/1948. | ||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
12/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1951. Dep: 10/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24212 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955. | ||
08/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24281 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1957. Dep: 03/09/1957. | ||
10/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1957. Dep: 19/09/1957. | ||
06/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/12/1960. Dep: 26/01/1961. | ||
27/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1962. Dep: 26/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63438 from West Hartlepool (51C) |