Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 163 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 163 Week
» 39209 Month
» 413222 Year
» 1634787 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2284 m/e 07/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3441   24/11/1946
British Railways 63441 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q607/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number E4
Works Number 32
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 07/1920 to Stockton (SKN)
Withdrawal Mon 23/12/1963 off Sunderland (52G)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 6/2/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SKN Stockton (New) m/e 07/1920
SEL Selby on 03/07/1930
NPT Newport (Teeside) on 19/06/1939
SKN Stockton on 01/02/1943
BLA Blaydon on 05/10/1947
52G Sunderland on 24/02/1963
   Withdrawn on 23/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BLA Blaydon w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 3w/e 02/03/1963
WDN   w/e 23/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1920 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/32)
24/10/1930 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D946)
31/08/1933 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2152)
21/10/1941 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 1967)
03/06/1944 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2390)
24/11/1950 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24161)
14/05/1954 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24251)
05/09/1958 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24298)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 26/02/1923 12/05/1923 76 days General  
Darlington Works 09/04/1925 25/08/1925 139 days General  
Darlington Works 12/10/1925 16/10/1925 5 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 07/03/1928 10/05/1928 65 days General
Boiler number 33 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 16/09/1930 24/10/1930 39 days General
Boiler number D946 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 01/07/1931 07/08/1931 38 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 06/07/1933 31/08/1933 57 days General
Boiler number 2152 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 30/04/1936 17/08/1936 110 days General  
Darlington Works 28/08/1939 13/10/1939 47 days General  
Darlington Works 02/08/1940 19/08/1940 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/09/1941 21/10/1941 30 days General
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 05/05/1944 03/06/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 2390 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 12/11/1945 29/11/1945 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 07/01/1947 22/02/1947 47 days General  
Gateshead Works 19/12/1948 04/01/1949 17 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63441
 
Darlington Works 18/10/1950 24/11/1950 38 days General
Boiler number 24161 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 19/03/1953 17/04/1953 30 days Heavy Casual  
Gateshead Works 05/04/1954 14/05/1954 40 days General
Boiler number 24251 (Diagram 50A)
 
Gateshead Works 28/07/1958 05/09/1958 40 days General
Boiler number 24298 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 23/06/1961 05/08/1961 44 days Light Casual
After collision
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1920 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2284
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 32
Allocated to Stockton (SKN)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
03/07/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
19/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
01/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3441    
05/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
24/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
23/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63441 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev