|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 31/10/1922 | 18/01/1923 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1923 | 22/03/1923 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1924 | 30/03/1925 | 111 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1927 | 24/02/1928 | 68 days | General | Boiler number D504 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1928 | 18/10/1928 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1930 | 15/05/1930 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1933 | 16/06/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D598 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1935 | 31/05/1935 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1965 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1937 | 15/11/1937 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1940 | 01/05/1940 | 28 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1942 | 04/03/1942 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1944 | 10/02/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1945 | 10/12/1945 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1949 | 17/08/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 24204 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63442 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1951 | 08/09/1951 | 20 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1951 | 11/09/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1953 | 06/01/1954 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24177 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1954 | 12/01/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1956 | 31/07/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 24203 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1956 | 16/08/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1957 | 07/02/1957 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1957 | 12/06/1957 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1959 | 04/09/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24319 (Diagram 50A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2285 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 33 Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
31/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1922. Dep: 18/01/1923. | ||
10/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1923. Dep: 22/03/1923. | ||
10/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1924. Dep: 30/03/1925. | ||
19/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1927. Dep: 24/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D504 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1928. Dep: 18/10/1928. | ||
24/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1930. Dep: 15/05/1930. | ||
05/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
11/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1933. Dep: 16/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D598 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1935. Dep: 31/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1965 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1937. Dep: 15/11/1937. | ||
04/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1940. Dep: 01/05/1940. | ||
27/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1942. Dep: 04/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1944. Dep: 10/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/11/1945. Dep: 10/12/1945. | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3442 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
08/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1949. Dep: 17/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24204 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63442 |
||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951. | ||
10/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1951. Dep: 11/09/1951. | ||
15/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 06/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24177 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 12/01/1954. | ||
18/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1956. Dep: 31/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24203 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1956. Dep: 16/08/1956. | ||
04/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1957. Dep: 07/02/1957. | ||
05/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1957. Dep: 12/06/1957. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
06/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1959. Dep: 04/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24319 (Diagram 50A) |
||
15/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63442 from Thornaby (51L) |