|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 11/10/1923 | 13/12/1923 | 64 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/06/1926 | 14/09/1926 | 106 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/12/1928 | 07/02/1929 | 60 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/12/1930 | 28/01/1931 | 45 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1932 | 29/07/1932 | 31 days | General | Boiler number E4/6 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1938 | 18/03/1938 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 2258 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1938 | 30/03/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1941 | 01/07/1941 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2441 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1942 | 16/12/1942 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number HL104 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1944 | 21/02/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24]93 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1944 | 06/03/1944 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1946 | 15/02/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3444 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1947 | 03/03/1947 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1949 | 11/10/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63444 |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/11/1949 | 09/01/1950 | 49 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1952 | 22/02/1952 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1953 | 15/08/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1953 | 18/08/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1956 | 23/08/1956 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1957 | 08/02/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1959 | 21/10/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24209 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1965 | 07/01/1965 | 1 day | Weighing |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2287 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 35 Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
11/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1923. Dep: 13/12/1923. | ||
01/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1926. Dep: 14/09/1926. | ||
10/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1928. Dep: 07/02/1929. | ||
15/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1930. Dep: 28/01/1931. | ||
29/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1932. Dep: 29/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/6 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1938. Dep: 18/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2258 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1938. Dep: 30/03/1938. | ||
12/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
28/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1941. Dep: 01/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2441 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1942. Dep: 16/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL104 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1944. Dep: 21/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24]93 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1944. Dep: 06/03/1944. | ||
20/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
28/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 15/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3444 |
||
26/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1947. Dep: 03/03/1947. | ||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
09/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1949. Dep: 11/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63444 |
||
22/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1949. Dep: 09/01/1950. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
17/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
23/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1952. Dep: 22/02/1952. | ||
08/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1953. Dep: 18/08/1953. | ||
09/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/07/1956. Dep: 23/08/1956. | ||
04/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1957. Dep: 08/02/1957. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
14/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1959. Dep: 21/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24209 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
07/01/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/01/1965. Dep: 07/01/1965. | ||
17/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63444 from Sunderland (52G) |