Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 198 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4464 Week
» 16242 Month
» 305634 Year
» 816736 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 2289   09/1920
LNER (1946) 3446   08/09/1946
BR 63446   05/10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q609/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number E4
Works Number 37
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 09/1920 to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Withdrawal Sun 05/06/1966 off West Hartlepool (51C)
Service Life 45 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Sald for scrap to Hughes Bolckow, Blyth, 7/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) 09/1920
SKN Stockton 07/02/1948
HAV Haverton Hill 06/02/1949
51F West Auckland 14/06/1959
51L Thornaby 02/02/1964
51C West Hartlepool 27/09/1964
   Withdrawn 05/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC HAV Haverton Hill w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 08/02/1964
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 10/10/1964
WDN   05/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/06/1929 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D845)
18/05/1934 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number D1945)
13/11/1940 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number HL110)
23/01/1943 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2433)
23/02/1945 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2423)
31/05/1947 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3159)
05/10/1950 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 24157)
08/07/1955 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24199)
08/02/1958 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24246)
16/09/1961 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24311)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 23/10/1923 22/12/1923 61 days General  
Darlington Works 10/08/1926 23/12/1926 136 days General  
Darlington Works 17/04/1929 11/06/1929 56 days General
Boiler number D845 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 20/10/1931 25/11/1931 37 days General  
Darlington Works 26/04/1934 18/05/1934 23 days General
Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 24/07/1936 09/09/1936 48 days General  
Darlington Works 02/12/1938 20/01/1939 50 days General
Boiler number 2431 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 15/10/1940 13/11/1940 30 days General
Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 24/12/1942 23/01/1943 31 days General
Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1945 23/02/1945 30 days General
Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50)
 
Gateshead Works 11/04/1946 30/04/1946 20 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 30/04/1947 31/05/1947 32 days General
Boiler number 3159 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 31/08/1950 05/10/1950 36 days General
Boiler number 24157 (Diagram 50)
Renumbered to BR 63446
 
Darlington Works 19/03/1953 18/04/1953 31 days Light Intermediate  
Darlington Works 20/04/1953 22/04/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/06/1955 08/07/1955 25 days General
Boiler number 24199 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 04/12/1956 13/12/1956 10 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 09/01/1958 08/02/1958 31 days General
Boiler number 2984 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 10/02/1958 12/02/1958 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/11/1960 12/01/1961 64 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 24/08/1961 16/09/1961 24 days General
Boiler number 24311 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 20/09/1961 28/09/1961 9 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as NER Number 2289
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 37
Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
23/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923.    
10/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1926. Dep: 23/12/1926.    
17/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1929. Dep: 11/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D845 (Diagram 50)
   
20/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1931. Dep: 25/11/1931.    
26/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1934. Dep: 18/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50)
   
24/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1936. Dep: 09/09/1936.    
02/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1938. Dep: 20/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2431 (Diagram 50)
   
15/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1940. Dep: 13/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50)
   
24/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1942. Dep: 23/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50)
   
25/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1945. Dep: 23/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50)
   
11/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1946. Dep: 30/04/1946.    
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3446    
30/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3159 (Diagram 50A)
   
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
31/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1950. Dep: 05/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24157 (Diagram 50)
Renumbered to BR 63446
   
19/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953.    
20/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953.    
14/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24199 (Diagram 50A)
   
04/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1956. Dep: 13/12/1956.    
09/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1958. Dep: 08/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2984 (Diagram 50A)
   
10/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1958. Dep: 12/02/1958.    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
10/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1960. Dep: 12/01/1961.    
24/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1961. Dep: 16/09/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24311 (Diagram 50A)
   
20/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961.    
02/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
27/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
05/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63446 from West Hartlepool (51C)    

prev prev