Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 6 Today
» 96 Yesterday
» 4270 Week
» 22033 Month
» 128347 Year
» 639449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 2291   10/1920
LNER (1946) 3448   03/05/1946
BR 63448 w/e 17/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Raven
Class Q6
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q610/1920
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number E4
Works Number 39
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 10/1920 to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Withdrawal Fri 08/11/1963 off Consett (52K)
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 25/11/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BOR Borough Gardens (New) 10/1920
HLD Hull Dairycoates 24/04/1939
WHL West Hartlepool 02/03/1940
HLS Hull Springhead 25/05/1940
HLD Hull Dairycoates 28/03/1943
BLA Blaydon 20/07/1947
HLD Hull Dairycoates 04/09/1949
SEL Selby 24/11/1949
52H Tyne Dock 13/09/1959
52K Consett 13/12/1959
   Withdrawn 08/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BLA Blaydon 20/07/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC SEL Selby w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 54D Consett 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   08/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1920 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number E4/39)
10/05/1932 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2429)
30/11/1937 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2567)
11/02/1941 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2652)
15/06/1943 Diagram 50 boiler fitted (number 2429)
03/05/1946 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 2988)
06/05/1949 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 3023)
01/02/1952 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24211)
09/09/1954 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24278)
28/08/1959 Diagram 50A boiler fitted (number 24322)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 20/08/1923 11/10/1923 53 days General  
Gateshead Works 16/11/1923 27/11/1923 12 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 28/10/1926 10/05/1927 195 days General  
Gateshead Works 17/09/1929 13/11/1929 58 days General  
Gateshead Works 07/04/1932 10/05/1932 34 days General
Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 11/03/1935 16/04/1935 37 days General  
Darlington Works 13/10/1937 30/11/1937 49 days General
Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 07/01/1941 11/02/1941 36 days General
Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 10/05/1943 15/06/1943 37 days General
Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50)
 
Darlington Works 26/03/1946 03/05/1946 39 days General
Boiler number 2988 (Diagram 50A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3448
 
Gateshead Works 04/07/1948 13/07/1948 10 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63448
 
Darlington Works 08/04/1949 06/05/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 10/05/1949 17/05/1949 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/02/1950 10/03/1950 37 days Light Casual
After derailment
 
Darlington Works 08/01/1952 01/02/1952 25 days General
Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 11/09/1953 24/09/1953 14 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 28/07/1954 09/09/1954 44 days General
Boiler number 24278 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 16/09/1954 27/09/1954 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/12/1956 05/01/1957 26 days General
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 27/07/1959 28/08/1959 33 days General
Boiler number 24322 (Diagram 50A)
 
Darlington Works 21/07/1961 09/11/1961 112 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 06/04/1962 17/05/1962 42 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as NER Number 2291
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 39
Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR)
Diagram 50 boiler fitted
   
20/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1923. Dep: 11/10/1923.    
16/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1923. Dep: 27/11/1923.    
28/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1926. Dep: 10/05/1927.    
17/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1929. Dep: 13/11/1929.    
07/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1932. Dep: 10/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50)
   
11/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1935. Dep: 16/04/1935.    
13/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1937. Dep: 30/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50)
   
24/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
02/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
25/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
07/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1941. Dep: 11/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1943. Dep: 15/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50)
   
26/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1946. Dep: 03/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2988 (Diagram 50A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3448
   
20/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
04/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1948. Dep: 13/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63448
   
08/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1949. Dep: 06/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 50A)
   
10/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1949. Dep: 17/05/1949.    
04/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
24/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Selby (SEL)    
02/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1950. Dep: 10/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
After derailment
   
08/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1952. Dep: 01/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A)
   
11/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1953. Dep: 24/09/1953.    
28/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1954. Dep: 09/09/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24278 (Diagram 50A)
   
16/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1954. Dep: 27/09/1954.    
11/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1956. Dep: 05/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 50A)
   
27/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24322 (Diagram 50A)
   
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (52K)    
21/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1961. Dep: 09/11/1961.    
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 5/1962 Link
06/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1962. Dep: 17/05/1962.    
08/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63448 from Consett (52K)    

prev prev