|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 06/06/1924 | 30/08/1924 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1926 | 24/08/1926 | 148 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/09/1929 | 19/11/1929 | 77 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/07/1932 | 15/09/1932 | 48 days | General | Boiler number E4/13 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1936 | 29/02/1936 | 41 days | General | Boiler number AW24 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1938 | 16/09/1938 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1941 | 26/02/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1943 | 05/05/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1943 | 04/06/1943 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/04/1945 | 27/04/1945 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2992 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/07/1948 | 09/08/1948 | 28 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63451 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2857 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1949 | 04/11/1949 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1952 | 31/05/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24227 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/01/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1954 | 12/08/1954 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1955 | 05/03/1955 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1955 | 15/04/1955 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1955 | 21/07/1955 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24157 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1955 | 08/08/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1957 | 21/12/1957 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 24159 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1957 | 27/12/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1960 | 05/08/1960 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 24327 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1960 | 15/09/1960 | 28 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2294 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 42 Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
06/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1924. Dep: 30/08/1924. | ||
16/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
30/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1926. Dep: 24/08/1926. | ||
01/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
04/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1929. Dep: 19/11/1929. | ||
30/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 15/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/13 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1936. Dep: 29/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW24 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1938. Dep: 16/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 26/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
06/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1943. Dep: 05/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2820 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/05/1943. Dep: 04/06/1943. | ||
12/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
17/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/04/1945. Dep: 27/04/1945. | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3451 | ||
12/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2992 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
13/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1948. Dep: 09/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63451 |
||
05/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2857 (Diagram 50) |
||
31/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1949. Dep: 04/11/1949. | ||
09/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1952. Dep: 31/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24227 (Diagram 50A) |
||
21/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. | ||
04/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1954. Dep: 12/08/1954. | ||
07/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955. | ||
31/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1955. Dep: 15/04/1955. | ||
24/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1955. Dep: 21/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24157 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1955. Dep: 08/08/1955. | ||
03/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24159 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1957. Dep: 27/12/1957. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
16/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1960. Dep: 05/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24327 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1960. Dep: 15/09/1960. | ||
08/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
01/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63451 from West Hartlepool (51C) |