|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/02/1924 | 30/04/1924 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1927 | 20/10/1927 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1929 | 20/08/1929 | 19 days | General | Boiler number D690 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1931 | 07/07/1931 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1934 | 01/06/1934 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2563 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1938 | 26/11/1938 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1938 | 02/12/1938 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1941 | 01/05/1941 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2582 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2261 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1947 | 05/12/1947 | 56 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1948 | 17/09/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63455 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1950 | 12/05/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24229 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/03/1952 | 22/04/1952 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24235 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1953 | 05/05/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/11/1955 | 29/12/1955 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1956 | 05/10/1956 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24152 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1959 | 08/10/1959 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24316 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1959 | 24/10/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1962 | 04/01/1963 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24186 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1965 | 10/01/1966 | 40 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2298 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 46 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
14/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1924. Dep: 30/04/1924. | ||
26/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1927. Dep: 20/10/1927. | ||
02/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1929. Dep: 20/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D690 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1931. Dep: 07/07/1931. | ||
05/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1934. Dep: 01/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2563 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938. | ||
28/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1938. Dep: 02/12/1938. | ||
02/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1941. Dep: 01/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2582 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
28/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2261 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3455 | ||
17/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. | ||
11/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947. | ||
26/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63455 |
||
18/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1950. Dep: 12/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24229 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 22/04/1952. | ||
27/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24235 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1953. Dep: 05/05/1953. | ||
16/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1955. Dep: 29/12/1955. | ||
10/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24152 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1959. Dep: 08/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24316 (Diagram 50A) |
||
15/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1959. Dep: 24/10/1959. | ||
03/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1962. Dep: 04/01/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24186 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
02/12/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1965. Dep: 10/01/1966. | ||
22/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63455 from Tyne Dock (52H) |