|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/11/1924 | 26/02/1925 | 99 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1925 | 13/04/1926 | 138 days | Light Repair | Wheels to Doncaster for dynamic balancing |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1927 | 29/11/1927 | 112 days | General | Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1931 | 08/12/1931 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1935 | 20/12/1935 | 46 days | General | Boiler number D1665 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1937 | 24/03/1937 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1937 | 28/05/1937 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1939 | 27/06/1939 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1939 | 15/09/1939 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1939 | 30/10/1939 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1939 | 14/11/1939 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1940 | 04/11/1940 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1941 | 27/06/1941 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1942 | 22/04/1942 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1942 | 01/07/1942 | 52 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1944 | 02/08/1944 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3052 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 28/01/1949 | 16/02/1949 | 20 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63463 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1950 | 01/07/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/01/1952 | 01/03/1952 | 48 days | Heavy Casual | Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/04/1953 | 13/05/1953 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1954 | 08/09/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1956 | 24/09/1956 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1958 | 28/05/1958 | 33 days | General | Westinghouse equipment removed Boiler number 24019 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1960 | 27/10/1960 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1962 | 07/04/1962 | 39 days | General | Complete AWS fitted Boiler number 24104 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 904 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
20/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1924. Dep: 26/02/1925. | ||
27/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1925. Dep: 13/04/1926. Work undertaken: Wheels to Doncaster for dynamic balancing |
||
10/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1927. Dep: 29/11/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1221 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
05/05/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
29/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1931. Dep: 08/12/1931. | ||
05/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1935. Dep: 20/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1665 (Diagram 49) |
||
18/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/03/1937. Dep: 24/03/1937. | ||
26/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1937. Dep: 28/05/1937. | ||
08/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1939. Dep: 27/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49) |
||
11/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1939. Dep: 15/09/1939. | ||
30/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1939. Dep: 30/10/1939. | ||
14/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1939. Dep: 14/11/1939. | ||
24/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1940. Dep: 04/11/1940. | ||
20/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1941. Dep: 27/06/1941. | ||
20/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 22/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3269 (Diagram 49A) |
||
11/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/05/1942. Dep: 01/07/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
27/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1944. Dep: 02/08/1944. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3463 | ||
02/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3052 (Diagram 49A) |
||
28/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1949. Dep: 16/02/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63463 |
||
01/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24079 (Diagram 49) |
||
14/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952. Work undertaken: Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working |
||
08/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1953. Dep: 13/05/1953. | ||
26/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. | ||
06/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1954. Dep: 08/09/1954. | ||
14/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1956. Dep: 24/09/1956. | ||
13/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. | ||
26/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1958. Dep: 28/05/1958. Work undertaken: Westinghouse equipment removed Boiler number 24019 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
29/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1960. Dep: 27/10/1960. | ||
28/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1962. Dep: 07/04/1962. Work undertaken: Complete AWS fitted Boiler number 24104 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63463 from Tyne Dock (52H) |