|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 27/01/1927 | 13/05/1927 | 107 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1928 | 08/01/1929 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1929 | 19/11/1929 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1623 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1933 | 04/05/1933 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1936 | 03/09/1936 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1939 | 22/03/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1940 | 12/06/1940 | 37 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1945 | 25/06/1945 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 2775 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/08/1946 | 09/09/1946 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1948 | 18/06/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2267 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 63465 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 36 days | General | Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working Boiler number 24013 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1951 | 07/03/1951 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/06/1952 | 12/07/1952 | 39 days | Unclassified | Air reservoir added. Position of air pumps changed |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/09/1952 | 08/09/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1952 | 16/12/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/06/1955 | 22/07/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24046 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/08/1955 | 11/08/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1957 | 30/08/1957 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1958 | 22/02/1958 | 26 days | General | Westinghouse equipment removed Boiler number 24027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1958 | 26/02/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1960 | 10/06/1960 | 29 days | Light Casual | After collision. Vacuum ejector removed |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1960 | 30/11/1960 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1961 | 05/08/1961 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 24050 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1961 | 15/08/1961 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1962 | 28/09/1962 | 16 days | Unclassified | Complete AWS fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
29/11/1952 | Darlington Works | Three 'Class 2' are out from North Road, no works Nos. on the date-plates. Diesels are completed to 12136: this was erroneously numbered 62136 but was corrected before leaving the Works. No. 62768 The Morpeth was badly damaged at the front end in a clash near Starbeck, and has therefore been withdrawn. Class 'G5' Nos. 67330, 67260 an 67276 have also been broken up. 'Q7' No. 63465 is again in traffic, after sustaining damage in a smash on the Consett road; this is one of the engines fitted with Westinghouse air equipment for working the new type ore wagons (used between Tyne Dock and Consett) which have air operated release apparatus for the doors, and vacuum brakes. | SLS/195302 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/03/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 624 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1225 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
22/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
27/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1927. Dep: 13/05/1927. | ||
19/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
20/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1928. Dep: 08/01/1929. | ||
07/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1929. Dep: 19/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1623 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
23/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1933. Dep: 04/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1936. Dep: 03/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1939. Dep: 22/03/1939. | ||
07/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/05/1940. Dep: 12/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1442 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
27/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1945. Dep: 25/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2775 (Diagram 49) |
||
20/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/08/1946. Dep: 09/09/1946. | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3465 | ||
13/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1948. Dep: 18/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2267 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 63465 |
||
23/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. | ||
20/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. Work undertaken: Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working Boiler number 24013 (Diagram 49A) |
||
26/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1951. Dep: 07/03/1951. | ||
04/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1952. Dep: 12/07/1952. Work undertaken: Air reservoir added. Position of air pumps changed |
||
05/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/09/1952. Dep: 08/09/1952. | ||
28/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. | ||
15/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 16/12/1952. | ||
20/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1955. Dep: 22/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24046 (Diagram 49A) |
||
05/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1955. Dep: 11/08/1955. | ||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 30/08/1957. | ||
28/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1958. Dep: 22/02/1958. Work undertaken: Westinghouse equipment removed Boiler number 24027 (Diagram 49A) |
||
24/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 26/02/1958. | ||
13/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960. Work undertaken: After collision. Vacuum ejector removed |
||
28/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1960. Dep: 30/11/1960. | ||
19/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1961. Dep: 05/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24050 (Diagram 49A) |
||
09/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1961. Dep: 15/08/1961. | ||
13/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1962. Dep: 28/09/1962. Work undertaken: Complete AWS fitted |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63465 from Tyne Dock (52H) |