Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 167 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 167 Week
» 39213 Month
» 413226 Year
» 1634791 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 625 on 18/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3466   10/11/1946
British Railways 63466 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q718/03/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 18/03/1924 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Total Mileage 879,342
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 24/4/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 18/03/1924
SKN Stockton on 19/07/1928
HAV Haverton Hill on 03/04/1930
WHL West Hartlepool on 06/12/1937
DAR Darlington on 04/11/1938
TDK Tyne Dock on 28/03/1943
54A Sunderland on 23/09/1956
52H Tyne Dock on 13/12/1959
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/03/1924 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1614)
20/01/1930 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1610)
26/06/1933 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1595)
23/02/1939 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2556)
10/11/1945 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3248)
17/04/1952 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24052)
29/11/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24108)
09/09/1961 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24077)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 29/09/1926 26/01/1927 120 days General  
Darlington Works 25/09/1929 20/01/1930 118 days General
Boiler number D1610 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 11/05/1933 26/06/1933 47 days General
Boiler number D1595 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 17/10/1935 17/10/1935 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 25/02/1936 02/04/1936 38 days General  
Darlington Works 16/01/1939 23/02/1939 39 days General
Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 22/10/1942 08/12/1942 48 days General  
Darlington Works 09/10/1945 10/11/1945 33 days General
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 14/04/1947 26/04/1947 13 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 23/03/1948 30/04/1948 39 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 63466
 
Darlington Works 12/11/1948 17/12/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 24039 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/02/1950 25/04/1950 58 days Heavy Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 14/12/1950 20/12/1950 7 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 24/10/1951 27/10/1951 4 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 21/03/1952 17/04/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 24052 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 11/11/1953 21/11/1953 11 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 05/07/1955 30/07/1955 26 days General  
Gateshead Works 16/05/1956 22/06/1956 38 days Light Casual
After derailment
 
Darlington Works 31/10/1957 29/11/1957 30 days General
Boiler number 24108 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 03/11/1959 11/11/1959 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/05/1961 09/09/1961 109 days General
Boiler number 24077 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1962 09/10/1962 16 days Unclassified
Complete AWS fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. SLS/196107
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 625
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
19/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
03/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV)    
06/12/1937 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
04/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3466    
23/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63466 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev