Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 92 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4052 Week
» 33638 Month
» 407651 Year
» 1629216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 629 on 08/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3469   10/11/1946
British Railways 63469 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q708/04/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 08/04/1924 to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Withdrawal Mon 03/12/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Total Mileage 641,280
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 5/4/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HLD Hull Dairycoates (New) on 08/04/1924
TDK Tyne Dock (on loan) on 24/04/1926
TDK Tyne Dock on 02/03/1927
AFP Annfield Plain on 14/10/1929
TDK Tyne Dock on 01/03/1940
52G Sunderland on 25/01/1959
52H Tyne Dock on 20/08/1961
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   on 03/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/04/1924 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1622)
08/03/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1633)
03/08/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1551)
21/11/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1616)
01/03/1943 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3035)
18/04/1946 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3271)
03/09/1948 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2775)
09/06/1951 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24021)
03/04/1954 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24090)
25/09/1956 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24042)
04/12/1959 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24076)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 02/07/1926 06/08/1926 36 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 09/03/1927 23/03/1927 15 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 19/10/1927 15/02/1928 120 days General  
Gateshead Works 27/12/1929 16/01/1930 21 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 03/02/1932 08/03/1932 35 days General
Boiler number D1633 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 30/12/1932 06/02/1933 39 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/06/1937 03/08/1937 56 days General
Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/10/1940 21/11/1940 30 days General
Boiler number D1616 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 02/02/1943 01/03/1943 28 days General
Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 02/02/1945 23/02/1945 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/03/1946 18/04/1946 37 days General
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 23/08/1947 17/09/1947 26 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 28/07/1948 03/09/1948 38 days General
Boiler number 2775 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 63469
 
Darlington Works 01/05/1951 09/06/1951 40 days General
Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working
Boiler number 24021 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 27/09/1951 10/10/1951 14 days Unclassified
Air reservoir added
 
Gateshead Works 26/03/1953 25/04/1953 31 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 09/03/1954 03/04/1954 26 days General
Boiler number 24090 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 05/04/1954 08/04/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/08/1956 25/09/1956 33 days General
Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A)
 
Gateshead Works 27/08/1958 10/10/1958 45 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 11/08/1959 11/08/1959 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/09/1959 04/12/1959 72 days General
Westinghouse equipment removed
Boiler number 24076 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 13/06/1960 17/08/1960 66 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 31/01/1961 23/02/1961 24 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 03/11/1961 06/12/1961 34 days Light Casual
Complete AWS fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/04/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 629
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
24/04/1926 Allocation Loaned to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
02/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1926. Dep: 06/08/1926.    
02/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
09/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1927. Dep: 23/03/1927.    
19/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1927. Dep: 15/02/1928.    
14/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP)    
27/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/12/1929. Dep: 16/01/1930.    
03/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1932. Dep: 08/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1633 (Diagram 49)
   
30/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/12/1932. Dep: 06/02/1933.    
09/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1937. Dep: 03/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1551 (Diagram 49)
   
01/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
23/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1940. Dep: 21/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number D1616 (Diagram 49)
   
02/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1943. Dep: 01/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 49A)
   
02/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1945. Dep: 23/02/1945.    
13/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 49A)
   
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3469    
23/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1947. Dep: 17/09/1947.    
28/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1948. Dep: 03/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2775 (Diagram 49)
Renumbered to BR 63469
   
01/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Vacuum ejector fitted - Modification for iron ore train working
Boiler number 24021 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 10/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Air reservoir added
   
26/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953.    
09/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24090 (Diagram 49A)
   
05/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 08/04/1954.    
24/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1956. Dep: 25/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 24042 (Diagram 49A)
   
27/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1958. Dep: 10/10/1958.    
25/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
11/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1959. Dep: 11/08/1959.    
24/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1959. Dep: 04/12/1959.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse equipment removed
Boiler number 24076 (Diagram 49A)
   
13/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/06/1960. Dep: 17/08/1960.    
31/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1961. Dep: 23/02/1961.    
20/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
03/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1961. Dep: 06/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Complete AWS fitted
   
03/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63469 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev