|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 11/07/1927 | 09/09/1927 | 61 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/01/1931 | 12/02/1931 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1933 | 14/08/1933 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1936 | 01/09/1936 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1937 | 06/05/1937 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1938 | 25/01/1939 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D1577 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1941 | 22/10/1941 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1942 | 22/12/1942 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1945 | 14/12/1945 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1947 | 14/07/1947 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1949 | 24/12/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 63471 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1949 | 04/01/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 24057 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1952 | 27/05/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1952 | 09/06/1952 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/02/1953 | 21/03/1953 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1955 | 10/03/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24035 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/11/1956 | 14/12/1956 | 32 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1958 | 21/11/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 24101 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1958 | 08/12/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1962 | 14/04/1962 | 31 days | General | Complete AWS fitted Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1962 | 15/05/1962 | 13 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 631 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1231 Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
11/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1927. Dep: 09/09/1927. | ||
07/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1931. Dep: 12/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1218 (Diagram 49) |
||
29/05/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
05/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1933. Dep: 14/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49) |
||
30/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1936. Dep: 01/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1492 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1937. Dep: 06/05/1937. | ||
10/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
08/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 25/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1577 (Diagram 49) |
||
15/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1941. Dep: 22/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1942. Dep: 22/12/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
08/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1667 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1945. Dep: 14/12/1945. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3471 | ||
23/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) |
||
01/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1947. Dep: 14/07/1947. | ||
03/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2556 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 63471 |
||
28/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1949. Dep: 04/01/1950. | ||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24057 (Diagram 49) |
||
26/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1952. Dep: 27/05/1952. | ||
03/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1952. Dep: 09/06/1952. | ||
03/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/02/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953. | ||
10/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1955. Dep: 10/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24035 (Diagram 49) |
||
17/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
13/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 14/12/1956. | ||
08/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1958. Dep: 21/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24101 (Diagram 49A) |
||
27/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1958. Dep: 08/12/1958. | ||
08/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
15/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1962. Dep: 14/04/1962. Work undertaken: Complete AWS fitted Boiler number 24064 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1962. Dep: 15/05/1962. | ||
17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63471 from Tyne Dock (52H) |