Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 634 on 08/05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3474   24/11/1946
British Railways 63474 w/e 22/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven
Class Q7
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q708/05/1924
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 08/05/1924 to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Total Mileage 610,558
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 18/4/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TDK Tyne Dock (New) on 08/05/1924
54A Sunderland on 23/09/1956
52H Tyne Dock on 15/01/1961
   Withdrawn on 17/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   on 17/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/05/1924 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1634)
12/10/1932 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1034)
03/06/1937 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1616)
18/09/1940 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1111)
23/06/1943 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number D1525)
13/04/1946 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 2879)
22/01/1949 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 3248)
26/04/1952 Diagram 49 boiler fitted (number 24051)
06/04/1957 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24090)
04/02/1961 Diagram 49A boiler fitted (number 24052)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 02/06/1928 16/08/1928 76 days General  
Gateshead Works 03/09/1932 12/10/1932 40 days General
Boiler number D1034 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 23/09/1936 22/10/1936 30 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/04/1937 03/06/1937 58 days General
Boiler number D1616 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 09/08/1940 18/09/1940 41 days General
Boiler number D1111 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/04/1943 23/06/1943 72 days General
Boiler number D1525 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 13/03/1946 13/04/1946 32 days General
Boiler number 2879 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 21/12/1948 22/01/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 49A)
Renumbered to BR 63474
 
Darlington Works 03/02/1949 18/02/1949 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/04/1952 26/04/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 24051 (Diagram 49)
 
Darlington Works 28/04/1952 09/05/1952 12 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/12/1954 05/01/1955 35 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 19/01/1955 25/01/1955 7 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 12/01/1956 24/02/1956 44 days Light Casual
After derailment
 
Darlington Works 14/02/1957 06/04/1957 52 days General
Boiler number 24090 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 08/04/1957 09/04/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/04/1957 07/05/1957 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/02/1958 14/02/1958 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 19/12/1960 04/02/1961 48 days General
Boiler number 24052 (Diagram 49A)
 
Darlington Works 12/10/1962 24/10/1962 13 days Unclassified
Complete AWS fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/05/1924 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 634
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)
Diagram 49 boiler fitted
   
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3474    
23/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
15/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
17/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63474 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev