Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1887 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15293 Week
» 68309 Month
» 187836 Year
» 3214689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
128 |
m/e |
10/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3128 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2509 |
|
23/05/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_128) |
23/02/1925 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1704) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
12/1920 |
12/1920 |
|
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
19/06/1922 |
04/12/1922 |
169 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
15/12/1924 |
23/02/1925 |
71 days |
General |
Boiler number D1704 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
16/11/1927 |
20/02/1928 |
97 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
27/06/1930 |
22/09/1930 |
88 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 128 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 943 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3128 |
|
|
19/06/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1922. Dep: 04/12/1922. |
|
|
23/05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2509 |
|
|
15/12/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1924. Dep: 23/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1704 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
|
16/11/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1927. Dep: 20/02/1928. |
|
|
18/11/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
27/06/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1930. Dep: 22/09/1930. |
|
|
10/08/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
21/09/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
01/10/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2509 from Selby (SEL) |
|
|