Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2480 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15886 Week
» 68902 Month
» 188429 Year
» 3215282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
412 |
m/e |
08/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3412 |
|
19/09/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
231 |
Works Number |
976 |
To Service |
During 08/1902 to Colwick (CLK) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/07/1928 off Colwick (CLK) |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1902 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1402) |
07/05/1909 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1404) |
07/03/1912 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1553) |
24/03/1917 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 1567) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 412 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 976 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/05/1909. |
|
|
05/1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/05/1909. |
|
|
07/05/1909 |
Modification |
Diagram 4Sat number 1404 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/03/1912. |
|
|
03/1912 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/03/1912. |
|
|
07/03/1912 |
Modification |
Diagram 4Sat number 1553 boiler fitted |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 24/03/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1567 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
|
03/10/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1922. Dep: 03/02/1923. |
|
|
03/06/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1925. Dep: 19/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3412
|
|
|
23/07/1928 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3412 from Colwick (CLK) |
|
|