Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 808 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4668 Week
» 7250 Month
» 271883 Year
» 1493448 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 417 m/e 01/1903
LNER (1924) 3417   15/03/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class Q2
Company History GNR/LNER/BR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q1 Sat01/1903
Q202/12/1908
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 231
Works Number 984
To Service During 01/1903 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Tue 17/12/1935 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) m/e 01/1903
   Withdrawn 17/12/1935

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1903 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1405)
02/12/1908 Diagram 14 boiler fitted (number 1577)
12/03/1921 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7341)
15/03/1924 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 989)
06/11/1926 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7194)
25/02/1933 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7835)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1908 02/12/1908   General
Rebuilt to class Q2
Boiler number 1577 (Diagram 14)
 
Doncaster Works 28/10/1920 12/03/1921 136 days General
Boiler number 7341 (Diagram 4Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 30/10/1923 15/03/1924 138 days General
Boiler number 989 (Diagram 4Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3417
 
Doncaster Works 25/05/1926 06/11/1926 166 days General
Boiler number 7194 (Diagram 4Sup)
 
Doncaster Works 28/09/1929 26/10/1929 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/01/1933 25/02/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 7835 (Diagram 4Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1903 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 417
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 984
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted
   
1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 00/00/1908. Dep: 02/12/1908.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class Q2
Boiler number 1577 (Diagram 14)
   
28/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1920. Dep: 12/03/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7341 (Diagram 4Sup)
   
30/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1923. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 989 (Diagram 4Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3417
   
25/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7194 (Diagram 4Sup)
   
28/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 26/10/1929.    
28/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1933. Dep: 25/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7835 (Diagram 4Sup)
   
17/12/1935 Withdrawn Condemned as 3417 from Colwick (CLK)    

prev prev