|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/1910 | General | |||||
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 13/11/1912 | General | Boiler number 7139 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1922 | 01/07/1922 | 138 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1924 | 06/08/1925 | 233 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3432 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1925 | 29/08/1925 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1929 | 16/02/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8173 (Diagram 4Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 432 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1027 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
08/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/08/1910. | ||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 13/11/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7139 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
14/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922. | ||
17/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1924. Dep: 06/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3432 |
||
18/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/08/1925. Dep: 29/08/1925. | ||
12/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1929. Dep: 16/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8173 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
16/02/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/10/1931 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3432 from Colwick (CLK) |