Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 348 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 4786 Month
» 312767 Year
» 1197148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 439 m/e 08/1904
LNER (1924) 3439   17/01/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class Q1
Company History GNR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Q1 Sat08/1904
Wheels 0-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 233
Works Number 1054
To Service During 08/1904 to Colwick (CLK)
Withdrawal Wed 09/02/1927 off Ardsley (ARD)
Service Life 22 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CLK Colwick (New) m/e 08/1904
ARD Ardsley 22/09/1925
   Withdrawn 09/02/1927

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1904 Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 1547)
24/03/1917 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1553)
17/01/1925 Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1561)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 1917 24/03/1917   General
Boiler number 1553 (Diagram 4Sat)
 
Doncaster Works 15/03/1921 03/09/1921 173 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/10/1924 17/01/1925 109 days General
Boiler number 1561 (Diagram 4Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3439
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1904 To Service To service as GNR Number 439
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1054
Allocated to Colwick (CLK)
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted
   
1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 24/03/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1553 (Diagram 4Sat)
   
15/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1921. Dep: 03/09/1921.    
01/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1561 (Diagram 4Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3439
   
22/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
09/02/1927 Withdrawn Condemned as 3439 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev