|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1913 | 08/08/1913 | General | Boiler number 7198 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1922 | 27/01/1923 | 109 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1925 | 10/10/1925 | 100 days | General | Boiler number 7203 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3444 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1929 | 11/05/1929 | 36 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 444 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1142 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 08/08/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7198 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
11/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1922. Dep: 27/01/1923. | ||
03/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7203 (Diagram 4Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3444 |
||
06/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929. | ||
12/07/1932 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3444 from Ardsley (ARD) |