Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 203 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7663 Week
» 5176 Month
» 233060 Year
» 1454625 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1171 m/e 12/1907
LNER (1924) 6171 m/e 03/1927
LNER (1946) 9901 m/e 05/1946
BR 69901 w/e 18/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class S1
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
S1/112/1907
S1/201/1932
Wheels 0-8-4T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9655
Works Number 5003
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal Tue 01/01/1957
Scrapping During 03/1957
Service Life 49 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1907
MEX Mexborough 01/01/1948
36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/01/1954
36C Frodingham 5w/e 23/04/1955
   Withdrawn 01/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 23/04/1955
WDN   01/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1932 Booster fitted
01/1932 Superheated boiler fitted
01/1943 Booster removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1171
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5003
   
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 6171    
01/1932 Modification Modification: Booster fitted    
01/1932 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
01/1943 Modification Modification: Booster removed    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9901    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mexborough (MEX)    
18/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69901    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
01/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69901    

prev prev