Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 28 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 23659 Week
» 88613 Month
» 291277 Year
» 3318130 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
2912 |
m/e |
04/1931 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7612 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
67612 |
on |
19/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
320 |
Works Number |
1757 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 04/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/01/1961 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
Information |
Bunker with coal rail |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1931 |
PKD |
|
Parkhead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/01/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/07/1961 |
Cowlairs Works (Scrap Road) |
Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. |
SLS/196108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2912 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7612 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
19/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67612 |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67612 |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|