|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2917 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7617 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) | ||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67617 | ||
14/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
11/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
27/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67617 | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |