Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1631 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15037 Week
» 68053 Month
» 187580 Year
» 3214433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
2933 |
m/e |
04/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7633 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67633 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
324 |
Works Number |
1805 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
Plain bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
17/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
11/02/1961 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
4w/e |
07/04/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/04/1963 |
Hurlford MPD (in store) |
in store-40151, 40640/2/65, 44189/98/281, 42743, 45266, 57249/84/353/9, 55240, 67607/16/33/64/7, whilst ex LYR 52275 was en route Shieldhall. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2933 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7633 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67633 |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67633 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|