Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 106 Today
» 1371 Yesterday
» 4066 Week
» 33652 Month
» 407665 Year
» 1629230 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) 479 m/e 05/1935
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7637 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 67637 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V1
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2T
Order Number 333
Works Number 1809
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 05/1935
Withdrawal w/e Thu 24/05/1962
Scrapping During 04/1963
Service Life 27 yrs , 24 dys
Information Plain bunker

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1935
HTN Heaton on 01/01/1948
54A Sunderland 4w/e 11/10/1958
52A Gateshead w/e 31/01/1959
52B Heaton w/e 17/06/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 24/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   on 24/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1935 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 479    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7637    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67637    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
24/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 67637    

prev prev