Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 378 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18181 Week
» 71197 Month
» 190724 Year
» 3217577 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
402 |
m/e |
08/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7644 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67644 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
335 |
Works Number |
1816 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 07/05/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
Information |
Plain bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1935 |
DFU |
|
Dunfermline Upper |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
EFD |
|
Eastfield |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
EFD |
Eastfield |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1946 |
General |
An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains |
SLS/194701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 402 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7644 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67644 |
|
|
07/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67644 |
|
|
03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|