Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4179 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17585 Week
» 70601 Month
» 190128 Year
» 3216981 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
414 |
m/e |
08/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7645 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67645 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
335 |
Works Number |
1817 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
Plain bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HTN |
Heaton |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
5w/e |
04/10/1958 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
5w/e |
12/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 414 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7645 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67645 |
|
|
09/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67645 |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|