Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 999 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19910 Week
» 84864 Month
» 287528 Year
» 3314381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
415 |
m/e |
10/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7646 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67646 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
335 |
Works Number |
1820 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 24/11/1964 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys |
Information |
Plain bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1935 |
NEV |
|
Neville Hill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
HTN |
|
Heaton |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
52A |
|
Gateshead |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/11/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HTN |
Heaton |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
06/07/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 415 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7646 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67646 |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
24/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67646 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|