Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
418 |
m/e |
12/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7648 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
67648 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
335 |
Works Number |
1824 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 25/01/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
14/01/1961 |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
06/05/1961 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
2w/e |
21/10/1961 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
6w/e |
30/12/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/01/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 418 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7648 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67648 |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
25/01/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67648 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|