Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1729 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15135 Week
» 68151 Month
» 187678 Year
» 3214531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
419 |
m/e |
01/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7650 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
67650 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
335 |
Works Number |
1826 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 10/08/1961 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1936 |
STG |
|
Stirling |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65C |
|
Parkhead |
4w/e |
14/03/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/08/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
14/03/1959 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/01/1962 |
Bo\'ness stored locos |
Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. |
SLS/196202 |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 419 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7650 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (STG) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67650 |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
10/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67650 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|