Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 800 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5401 Week
» 16948 Month
» 416630 Year
» 493217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4771   13/06/1936
LNER (1946 1st) 700   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 800   12/11/1946
BR 60800   04/02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/06/1936 GREEN ARROW

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1837
To Service Tue 13/06/1936 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Tue 21/08/1962 off Kings Cross (34A)
Service Life 26 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Withdrawn for preservation. Boiler changed to 29483 (ex84l) in November 62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) 13/06/1936
38E Woodford Halse 17/05/1953
34A Kings Cross 28/06/1953
   Withdrawn 21/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   21/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/06/1936 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 8929)
21/08/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2905)
04/02/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9165)
10/11/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29345)
12/02/1952 Modified pony truck
19/03/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29485)
11/01/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29379)
17/11/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
16/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
06/01/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29478)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 21/01/1937 27/01/1937 7 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/05/1937 04/06/1937 5 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 14/09/1937 23/10/1937 40 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/12/1938 31/12/1938 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/07/1939 16/09/1939 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/08/1941 13/09/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/07/1943 21/08/1943 43 days General
Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 07/07/1945 18/08/1945 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/02/1947 22/03/1947 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/07/1947 04/08/1947 16 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/12/1947 05/01/1948 25 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/12/1948 04/02/1949 38 days General
Boiler number 9165 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60800
 
Doncaster Works 12/10/1950 10/11/1950 30 days General
Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 15/05/1951 30/05/1951 16 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 27/01/1952 12/02/1952 17 days Light Casual
Modified pony truck
 
Doncaster Works 06/08/1952 02/09/1952 28 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 16/02/1954 19/03/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1956 20/03/1956 36 days General  
Darlington Works 06/12/1957 11/01/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 21/01/1958 23/01/1958 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/11/1958 17/11/1958 8 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 14/04/1959 16/04/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 30/11/1959 06/01/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 29478 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 17/05/1960 19/05/1960 3 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/06/1936 To Service To service as LNER Number 4771, name: GREEN ARROW
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1837
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
21/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1937. Dep: 27/01/1937.    
31/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 04/06/1937.    
14/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937.    
24/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938.    
29/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939.    
09/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.    
10/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109)
   
07/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 700 but not taken up    
12/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 800    
06/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.    
20/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1947. Dep: 04/08/1947.    
12/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1947. Dep: 05/01/1948.    
29/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1948. Dep: 04/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9165 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60800
   
12/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1950. Dep: 10/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109)
   
15/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1951. Dep: 30/05/1951.    
27/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1952. Dep: 12/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Modified pony truck
   
06/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/08/1952. Dep: 02/09/1952.    
17/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
28/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
16/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109)
   
14/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1956. Dep: 20/03/1956.    
06/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109)
   
21/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1958. Dep: 23/01/1958.    
10/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 17/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
14/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 16/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
30/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1959. Dep: 06/01/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29478 (Diagram 109)
   
17/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1960. Dep: 19/05/1960.    
21/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60800 from Kings Cross (34A)    

prev