|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1937 | 27/01/1937 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1937 | 04/06/1937 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1937 | 23/10/1937 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1938 | 31/12/1938 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1939 | 16/09/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1945 | 18/08/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1947 | 04/08/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1947 | 05/01/1948 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1948 | 04/02/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9165 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60800 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1950 | 10/11/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1951 | 30/05/1951 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1952 | 12/02/1952 | 17 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1952 | 02/09/1952 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1954 | 19/03/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1956 | 20/03/1956 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1958 | 23/01/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1958 | 17/11/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1959 | 16/04/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1959 | 06/01/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29478 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1960 | 19/05/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/06/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4771, name: GREEN ARROW Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1837 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
21/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1937. Dep: 27/01/1937. | ||
31/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 04/06/1937. | ||
14/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937. | ||
24/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938. | ||
29/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939. | ||
09/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. | ||
10/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 700 but not taken up | ||
12/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 800 | ||
06/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. | ||
20/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1947. Dep: 04/08/1947. | ||
12/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1947. Dep: 05/01/1948. | ||
29/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1948. Dep: 04/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9165 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60800 |
||
12/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1950. Dep: 10/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1951. Dep: 30/05/1951. | ||
27/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1952. Dep: 12/02/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
06/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/08/1952. Dep: 02/09/1952. | ||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
28/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
16/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1956. Dep: 20/03/1956. | ||
06/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1958. Dep: 23/01/1958. | ||
10/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 17/11/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 16/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
30/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1959. Dep: 06/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29478 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1960. Dep: 19/05/1960. | ||
21/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60800 from Kings Cross (34A) |