|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/02/1938 | 22/03/1938 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1938 | 17/11/1938 | 67 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1942 | 11/07/1942 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 27 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3130 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1948 | 13/11/1948 | 55 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60805 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1950 | 01/08/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29506 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1950 | 15/08/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/02/1951 | 08/02/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1951 | 15/10/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1952 | 28/06/1952 | 31 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1952 | 02/07/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29454 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1953 | 03/12/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1954 | 12/08/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1956 | 31/05/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29543 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1957 | 13/01/1958 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1958 | 22/08/1958 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29416 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1958 | 15/09/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1959 | 10/02/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1960 | 05/11/1960 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/07/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4776 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1703 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1938. Dep: 22/03/1938. | ||
12/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1938. Dep: 17/11/1938. | ||
30/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. | ||
26/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
24/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. | ||
15/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
14/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 705 but not taken up | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 805 | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3130 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. | ||
20/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60805 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
20/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 01/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29506 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 15/08/1950. | ||
06/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1951. Dep: 08/02/1951. | ||
05/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. | ||
10/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1951. Dep: 15/10/1951. | ||
29/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952. | ||
30/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1952. Dep: 02/07/1952. | ||
20/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29454 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1953. Dep: 03/12/1953. | ||
27/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
22/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1954. Dep: 12/08/1954. | ||
30/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1956. Dep: 31/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29543 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
16/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1957. Dep: 13/01/1958. | ||
05/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1958. Dep: 22/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29416 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1958. Dep: 15/09/1958. | ||
05/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1959. Dep: 10/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
21/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29490 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60805 from York (North) (50A) | ||
03/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |