|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/05/1938 | 27/05/1938 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1938 | 30/08/1938 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1939 | 28/04/1939 | 66 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1939 | 26/05/1939 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1940 | 07/02/1940 | 3 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1940 | 27/06/1940 | 7 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1941 | 12/03/1941 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1943 | 19/03/1943 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1943 | 08/04/1943 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1944 | 14/09/1944 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1946 | 10/02/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1948 | 13/03/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1949 | 16/07/1949 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1950 | 26/08/1950 | 62 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1950 | 18/01/1951 | 65 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1951 | 02/11/1951 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1952 | 10/06/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29542 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1954 | 27/04/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1955 | 30/12/1955 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1957 | 10/10/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1958 | 11/09/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1959 | 21/05/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1959 | 18/09/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28073 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1959 | 16/10/1959 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1961 | 11/05/1961 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1961 | 27/11/1961 | 19 days | Light Casual | Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1962 | 05/10/1962 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Crossing) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/08/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4777 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1704 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
11/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1938. Dep: 27/05/1938. | ||
30/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/08/1938. Dep: 30/08/1938. | ||
22/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1939. Dep: 28/04/1939. | ||
25/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1939. Dep: 26/05/1939. | ||
05/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1940. Dep: 07/02/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
21/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1940. Dep: 27/06/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
22/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1941. Dep: 12/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1943. Dep: 19/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3342 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
30/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1943. Dep: 08/04/1943. | ||
05/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1944. Dep: 14/09/1944. | ||
10/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 706 but not taken up | ||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 10/02/1946. | ||
27/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 806 | ||
19/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
04/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948. | ||
11/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60806 | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
02/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1949. Dep: 16/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/06/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950. | ||
15/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1950. Dep: 18/01/1951. | ||
08/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951. | ||
12/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1952. Dep: 10/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29542 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
04/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. | ||
20/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1954. Dep: 27/04/1954. | ||
15/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1955. Dep: 30/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1957. Dep: 10/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
08/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1958. Dep: 11/09/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1959. Dep: 21/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28073 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/09/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
13/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1961. Dep: 11/05/1961. | ||
09/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1961. Dep: 27/11/1961. Work undertaken: Smith speedometer fitted |
||
27/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1962. Dep: 05/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
05/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
02/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
04/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60806 from York (North) (50A) | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |