|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 19/11/1937 | 02/12/1937 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1938 | 02/06/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1938 | 23/11/1938 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1940 | 29/03/1940 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1941 | 02/10/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1943 | 12/04/1943 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1945 | 28/04/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 23 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1947 | 04/10/1947 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1949 | 16/04/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1950 | 11/01/1951 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1952 | 14/01/1952 | 8 days | Light Casual | After derailment |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1952 | 08/01/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1954 | 05/08/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29543 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1956 | 12/04/1956 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1957 | 16/01/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1958 | 11/07/1958 | 38 days | Light Casual | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1958 | 20/08/1958 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1959 | 06/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1960 | 23/08/1960 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1961 | 21/03/1961 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1962 | 13/02/1962 | 14 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/08/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4778 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1705 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
19/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1937. Dep: 02/12/1937. | ||
01/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1938. Dep: 02/06/1938. | ||
27/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1938. Dep: 23/11/1938. | ||
21/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1940. Dep: 29/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1941. Dep: 02/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3113 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1943. Dep: 12/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 707 but not taken up | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 807 | ||
27/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. | ||
20/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1947. Dep: 04/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60807 | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
07/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1949. Dep: 16/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 11/01/1951. | ||
07/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1952. Dep: 14/01/1952. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
01/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1952. Dep: 08/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1954. Dep: 05/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29543 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1956. Dep: 12/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29341 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1957. Dep: 16/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1958. Dep: 11/07/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958. | ||
04/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
28/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1960. Dep: 23/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1961. Dep: 21/03/1961. | ||
31/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1962. Dep: 13/02/1962. | ||
19/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60807 from Heaton (52B) | ||
07/01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |