|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 18/05/1938 | 19/05/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1938 | 17/02/1939 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1940 | 02/03/1940 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1940 | 22/10/1940 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1941 | 10/07/1941 | 56 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1942 | 06/05/1942 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1944 | 10/08/1944 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1945 | 10/11/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1948 | 28/08/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60811 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1950 | 23/06/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3114 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1952 | 08/05/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1952 | 26/05/1952 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/12/1955 | 09/12/1955 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1956 | 20/03/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28060 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1956 | 13/09/1956 | 16 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1958 | 14/05/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1959 | 04/02/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28082 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Waiting works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/09/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4782 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1709 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
18/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1938. Dep: 19/05/1938. | ||
29/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1938. Dep: 17/02/1939. | ||
29/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/02/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. | ||
27/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1940. Dep: 22/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1941. Dep: 10/07/1941. | ||
15/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/04/1942. Dep: 06/05/1942. | ||
08/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
14/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944. | ||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945. | ||
28/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 711 | ||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 811 | ||
07/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60811 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
22/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1950. Dep: 23/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3114 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1952. Dep: 26/05/1952. | ||
30/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
12/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
12/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 09/12/1955. | ||
17/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1956. Dep: 20/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28060 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1956. Dep: 13/09/1956. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
09/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1958. Dep: 14/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
29/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1959. Dep: 04/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
30/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28082 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60811 from Heaton (52B) | ||
10/05/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |