|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/05/1938 | 21/05/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1939 | 17/03/1939 | 54 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1939 | 04/08/1939 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1940 | 30/01/1940 | 6 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1940 | 23/04/1940 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1940 | 20/11/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1942 | 16/12/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 22 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3061 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1947 | 18/10/1947 | 54 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1949 | 23/06/1949 | 24 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 60812 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1950 | 28/04/1950 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1951 | 07/07/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1951 | 14/07/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1954 | 04/06/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1954 | 30/06/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1954 | 13/07/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1956 | 17/02/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1956 | 29/05/1956 | 31 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1958 | 20/02/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1958 | 16/04/1958 | 52 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1959 | 17/04/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1959 | 25/11/1959 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1961 | 04/07/1961 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1961 | 19/01/1962 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28089 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
11/10/1964 | Swindon Works (C shop area) | Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 | SLS/196411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/09/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4783 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1710 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938. | ||
23/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1939. Dep: 17/03/1939. | ||
02/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939. | ||
25/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1940. Dep: 30/01/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
20/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1940. Dep: 23/04/1940. | ||
09/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1940. Dep: 20/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1942. Dep: 16/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. | ||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29467 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 712 but not taken up | ||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 812 | ||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3061 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947. | ||
31/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1949. Dep: 23/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60812 |
||
01/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1950. Dep: 28/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/06/1951. Dep: 07/07/1951. | ||
09/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1951. Dep: 14/07/1951. | ||
01/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29545 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1954. Dep: 04/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1954. Dep: 30/06/1954. | ||
07/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1954. Dep: 13/07/1954. | ||
16/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1956. Dep: 17/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1956. Dep: 29/05/1956. | ||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 20/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 16/04/1958. | ||
13/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
31/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1961. Dep: 04/07/1961. | ||
16/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1961. Dep: 19/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28089 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
16/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60812 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |