|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/07/1938 | 06/07/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1940 | 27/01/1940 | 7 days | Light Repair | Pony truck exam |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1943 | 24/07/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2959 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3122 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1947 | 29/08/1947 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1948 | 14/09/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60817 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1951 | 05/02/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1951 | 02/11/1951 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1951 | 20/12/1951 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1953 | 18/09/1953 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1955 | 04/11/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1957 | 22/11/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28059 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1957 | 19/12/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1958 | 03/07/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1959 | 23/04/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1960 | 09/03/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28075 (Diagram 109) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1962 | 09/02/1962 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1962 | 14/06/1962 | 21 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/11/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4788 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1715 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
05/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1938. Dep: 06/07/1938. | ||
15/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. | ||
11/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
01/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
12/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. | ||
28/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
03/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2959 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 717 but not taken up | ||
01/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 817 | ||
08/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3122 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1947. Dep: 29/08/1947. | ||
06/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1948. Dep: 14/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60817 |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
04/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 05/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951. | ||
30/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1951. Dep: 20/12/1951. | ||
26/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1953. Dep: 18/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1955. Dep: 04/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
24/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1957. Dep: 22/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28059 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1957. Dep: 19/12/1957. | ||
26/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1958. Dep: 03/07/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
21/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1959. Dep: 23/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
26/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1960. Dep: 09/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28075 (Diagram 109) Double Chimney fitted |
||
22/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
30/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. | ||
08/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1962. Dep: 09/02/1962. | ||
25/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1962. Dep: 14/06/1962. | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60817 from New England (34E) | ||
28/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |