Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 239 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 239 Week
» 30529 Month
» 333719 Year
» 1555284 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4790 on 15/11/1937
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 719   30/03/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 819   02/06/1946
British Railways 60819 on 05/03/1948
British Railways (BR Tmp) E819   05/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 15/11/1937 to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping Fri 18/10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) on 15/11/1937
64B Haymarket on 01/01/1959
64A St Margarets on 10/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN OSW Oswestry m/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 17/01/1959
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 21/11/1959
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/11/1937 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2912)
12/10/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3099)
17/08/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3373)
05/03/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3363)
21/10/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29451)
29/12/1951 Modified pony truck
18/10/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29511)
15/01/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29343)
07/09/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29512)
03/05/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28057)
03/03/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29423)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 22/12/1937 06/01/1938 16 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 13/05/1939 13/05/1939 1 day Unclassified
ARP
 
Doncaster Works 30/11/1939 20/01/1939 -313 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 10/07/1940 10/08/1940 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 09/08/1941 04/10/1941 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/05/1943 10/06/1943 30 days General
Darlington maintained from 1/8/43
 
Darlington Works 07/09/1944 12/10/1944 36 days General
Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 18/07/1945 04/09/1945 49 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 15/12/1945 29/12/1945 15 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 01/07/1946 17/08/1946 48 days General
Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 24/01/1948 05/03/1948 42 days General
Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E819
 
Darlington Works 07/11/1949 08/12/1949 32 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 60819
 
Darlington Works 20/09/1950 21/10/1950 32 days General
Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 19/12/1951 29/12/1951 11 days Light Casual
Modified pony truck
 
Darlington Works 17/09/1952 18/10/1952 32 days General
Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 20/10/1952 22/10/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/10/1952 31/10/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/09/1953 27/11/1953 72 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 15/12/1953 21/01/1954 38 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/12/1954 15/01/1955 34 days General
Boiler number 29343 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 17/01/1955 18/01/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/08/1956 07/09/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 31/03/1958 03/05/1958 34 days General
Boiler number 28057 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 05/05/1958 06/05/1958 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/02/1960 03/03/1960 29 days General
Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 01/04/1960 14/04/1960 14 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803
05/05/1962 Bathgate MPD Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/11/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4790
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
22/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/12/1937. Dep: 06/01/1938.    
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
ARP
   
30/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1939. Dep: 20/01/1939.    
10/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940.    
09/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941.    
12/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1943. Dep: 10/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Darlington maintained from 1/8/43
   
07/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1944. Dep: 12/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109)
   
18/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1945. Dep: 04/09/1945.    
15/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945.    
30/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 719    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 819    
01/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3373 (Diagram 109)
   
24/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3363 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E819
   
07/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 08/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60819
   
20/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109)
   
19/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Modified pony truck
   
17/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109)
   
20/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 22/10/1952.    
30/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1952. Dep: 31/10/1952.    
17/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1953. Dep: 27/11/1953.    
15/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 21/01/1954.    
13/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29343 (Diagram 109)
   
17/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1955. Dep: 18/01/1955.    
03/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1956. Dep: 07/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109)
   
31/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28057 (Diagram 109)
   
05/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 06/05/1958.    
01/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
10/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
04/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1960. Dep: 03/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109)
   
01/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1960. Dep: 14/04/1960.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60819 from St Margarets (64A)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 819 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev