|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/05/1938 | 27/05/1938 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1939 | 22/03/1939 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1939 | 16/11/1939 | 65 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1941 | 18/06/1941 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1942 | 15/07/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1944 | 27/06/1944 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1946 | 18/05/1946 | 45 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 823 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1948 | 17/02/1948 | 29 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E823 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1949 | 07/12/1949 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60823 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1951 | 13/10/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29505 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1953 | 18/06/1953 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1955 | 28/02/1955 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1955 | 23/07/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1957 | 11/05/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1957 | 10/07/1957 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1958 | 11/01/1958 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1958 | 14/11/1958 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1958 | 31/12/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1959 | 22/01/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1961 | 20/05/1961 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1961 | 07/06/1961 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/04/1953 | Scottish Miscellany | The 7.0 p.m. Edinburgh (Waverley) to Glasgow (Queen Street) Sundays only train has this year produced a number of York 50A locos. These include 60140 (three times), 60501 an 60515 (twice), 60502 an 60512. Also seen on this train 60095 (68E), 60965 (64A), 60823 (64A). This train is worked off St. Margarets depot, the engine returning on the Monday morning. No. 67500 a 4-4-2T has occasionally appeared on the Hyndland and Milngavie trains during recent weeks. New loco. No. 76000 was noted on (23/4) on local goods to Buchanan Street. B.R. 2-6-4T are now fairly regularly used on 5.51 p.m. Carlisle to Glasgow (St. Enoch). Water is taken at Dumfries and often at Kilmarnock. With 80008 some excellent work was experienced. A late start of 11 mins. at Carlisle was reduced to a late arrival at Dumfries of 5 mins. A late start from Dumfries of 8 minutes was converted to a 2 min. early arrival at Kilmarnock. Up the Nith Valley 50 m.p.h. was regularly got with eight coaches. From Kilmarnock to a stop at Gorbals Jct. the time was 30 mins. 46 secs. including a 15 m.p.h. crawl from Strathbungo. Between Shilford and Neilson 77 m.p.h. was reached. The crew appeared to have no trouble with the train at any time, in fact one would suggest their only trouble was to hold the engine in check, so freely did it run. 40185 (2-6-2T) has been working the Kirkcudbright branch recently. On occasion of Cup Final in Glasgow on (23/4) the bulk of the trains from Aberdeen were worked by L.M. Class 5, 4-6-0, assisted by 61400 of Kittybrewster depot and 60531 Bahram. |
SLS/195306 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
06/01/1962 | Oswestry Works | Under repair-2236 (89C), 7025 (89A), 78000 (89C), 92247 and W & L 823. 9017 was stored with tender 1805 of May, 1911. | SLS/196202 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/12/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4794 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1721 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1938. Dep: 27/05/1938. | ||
22/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1939. Dep: 22/03/1939. | ||
13/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1939. Dep: 16/11/1939. | ||
30/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1941. Dep: 18/06/1941. | ||
03/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1942. Dep: 15/07/1942. | ||
09/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1944. Dep: 27/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 723 but not taken up | ||
04/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 823 |
||
20/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1948. Dep: 17/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E823 |
||
03/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1949. Dep: 07/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3324 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60823 |
||
25/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
13/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1951. Dep: 13/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29505 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/05/1953. Dep: 18/06/1953. | ||
04/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1955. Dep: 28/02/1955. | ||
27/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1955. Dep: 23/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. | ||
10/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/07/1957. Dep: 10/07/1957. | ||
07/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1958. Dep: 11/01/1958. | ||
06/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958. | ||
26/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1958. Dep: 31/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
12/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1959. Dep: 22/01/1959. | ||
16/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth (LNER) (PTH) | ||
18/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1961. Dep: 20/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
31/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1961. Dep: 07/06/1961. | ||
26/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60823 from Perth (LNER) (PTH) | ||
10/04/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |