Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 858 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2973 Week
» 25479 Month
» 328669 Year
» 1550234 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4795 on 22/12/1937
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 724 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 824   30/06/1946
British Railways 60824   16/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 22/12/1937 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 26/09/1966 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 28 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery and Scrap Co, Wishaw ll/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) on 22/12/1937
DON Doncaster on 09/03/1944
STM St Margarets on 13/10/1945
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 27/01/1947
64B Haymarket on 01/01/1959
64A St Margarets on 10/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 26/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 27/01/1947
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 17/01/1959
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 21/11/1959
WDN   on 26/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/12/1937 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2921)
22/05/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2923)
24/03/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3000)
01/11/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3053)
04/01/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29461)
26/01/1952 Modified pony truck
16/09/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29475)
11/03/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29507)
01/11/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29527)
18/03/1960 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
18/03/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29531)
08/02/1961 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
10/05/1963 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29448)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/05/1938 25/05/1938 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 15/03/1939 18/03/1939 4 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/04/1939 01/07/1939 64 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/03/1941 03/05/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/05/1943 22/05/1943 22 days General
Boiler number 2923 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 03/02/1945 24/03/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 3000 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 26/09/1946 01/11/1946 37 days General
Boiler number 3053 (Diagram 109)
 
Cowlairs Works 01/10/1947 04/10/1947 4 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 27/05/1948 16/07/1948 51 days General
Renumbered to BR 60824
 
Darlington Works 21/07/1948 24/07/1948 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 23/10/1948 30/10/1948 8 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 06/01/1950 10/02/1950 36 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 28/11/1950 04/01/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 21/01/1952 26/01/1952 6 days Light Casual
Modified pony truck
 
Darlington Works 05/05/1952 24/06/1952 51 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 22/09/1952 04/10/1952 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/08/1953 16/09/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 29475 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 12/02/1955 11/03/1955 28 days General
Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109)
 
Inverurie Works 20/03/1956 21/03/1956 2 days Unclassified
Tender floor welded
 
Darlington Works 02/10/1956 01/11/1956 31 days General
Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 02/06/1958 04/07/1958 33 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 15/02/1960 18/03/1960 33 days General
Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 11/10/1960 08/02/1961 121 days Heavy Casual
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 05/04/1963 10/05/1963 36 days General
Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 22/05/1963 23/05/1963 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/03/1965 01/04/1965 32 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
31/07/1953 V2 failure In July V2 60824 failed between Arbroath and Elliott Jct. The engine and its ten-coach train was propelled to Arbroath by L.M.R. 2-6-0, No. 43131. SLS/195312
05/05/1962 Bathgate MPD Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/12/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4795
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 25/05/1938.    
15/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939.    
29/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939.    
29/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941.    
01/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2923 (Diagram 109)
   
09/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3000 (Diagram 109)
   
13/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 724 but not taken up    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 824    
26/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1946. Dep: 01/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3053 (Diagram 109)
   
27/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
01/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1947. Dep: 04/10/1947.    
27/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60824
   
21/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/07/1948. Dep: 24/07/1948.    
23/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948.    
06/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1950. Dep: 10/02/1950.    
28/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1950. Dep: 04/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109)
   
21/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1952. Dep: 26/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Modified pony truck
   
05/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1952. Dep: 24/06/1952.    
22/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.    
17/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1953. Dep: 16/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29475 (Diagram 109)
   
12/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1955. Dep: 11/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109)
   
20/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1956. Dep: 21/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender floor welded
   
02/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 01/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109)
   
02/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/06/1958. Dep: 04/07/1958.    
01/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
10/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
15/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1960. Dep: 18/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
11/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1960. Dep: 08/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
05/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1963. Dep: 10/05/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109)
   
22/05/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1963. Dep: 23/05/1963.    
01/03/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1965. Dep: 01/04/1965.    
26/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60824 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev