Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 784 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2899 Week
» 25405 Month
» 328595 Year
» 1550160 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 4796 on 06/01/1938
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 725 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 825   30/06/1946
British Railways 60825   23/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 06/01/1938 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 27/04/1964 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 26 yrs, 3 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Into Cowlairs Works for cutting up 9/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) on 06/01/1938
STM St Margarets on 13/10/1945
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 27/01/1947
64A St Margarets on 20/11/1949
62B Dundee Tay Bridge on 27/04/1964
   Withdrawn on 27/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 27/01/1947
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 26/11/1949
WDN   on 27/04/1964
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 09/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/01/1938 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2923)
17/04/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2937)
03/05/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3014)
09/08/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3101)
20/06/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29499)
25/06/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29483)
06/04/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28051)
31/03/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
31/03/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29419)
12/07/1960 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
12/01/1963 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28073)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 30/06/1938 01/07/1938 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 07/03/1939 11/03/1939 5 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 27/05/1939 08/07/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/02/1941 22/03/1941 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/03/1943 17/04/1943 36 days General
Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 18/09/1943 02/10/1943 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 06/01/1945 17/02/1945 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/03/1947 03/05/1947 37 days General
Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 15/05/1947 24/05/1947 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/03/1948 23/04/1948 25 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 60825
 
Darlington Works 29/05/1948 23/06/1948 26 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/07/1948 27/07/1948 19 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/06/1949 09/08/1949 56 days General
Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/07/1951 23/08/1951 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 19/05/1953 20/06/1953 33 days General
Boiler number 29499 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 22/06/1953 25/06/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 27/10/1953 17/11/1953 22 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/05/1955 25/06/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 29483 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 27/06/1955 28/06/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/05/1956 10/05/1956 4 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 05/03/1957 06/04/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 28051 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 08/04/1957 10/04/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/02/1959 31/03/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 29419 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 12/01/1960 23/01/1960 12 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 02/06/1960 12/07/1960 41 days Heavy Casual
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 11/12/1962 12/01/1963 33 days General
Boiler number 28073 (Diagram 109)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/01/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4796
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
30/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1938. Dep: 01/07/1938.    
07/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939.    
27/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939.    
22/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.    
13/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109)
   
18/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943.    
06/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945.    
13/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 725 but not taken up    
30/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 825    
27/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
28/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109)
   
15/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947.    
30/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60825
   
29/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1948. Dep: 23/06/1948.    
09/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1948. Dep: 27/07/1948.    
15/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1949. Dep: 09/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109)
   
20/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
11/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/07/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951.    
19/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29499 (Diagram 109)
   
22/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1953. Dep: 25/06/1953.    
27/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 17/11/1953.    
25/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29483 (Diagram 109)
   
27/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1955. Dep: 28/06/1955.    
07/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1956. Dep: 10/05/1956.    
05/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1957. Dep: 06/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28051 (Diagram 109)
   
08/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/04/1957. Dep: 10/04/1957.    
24/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1959. Dep: 31/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29419 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
12/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1960. Dep: 23/01/1960.    
02/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1960. Dep: 12/07/1960.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
11/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1962. Dep: 12/01/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28073 (Diagram 109)
   
27/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 60825 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
27/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    

prev prev