Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 467 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6221 Week
» 34179 Month
» 68821 Year
» 1290386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4798   18/01/1938
LNER (1946 1st) 727   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 827   27/10/1946
BR 60827   12/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 18/01/1938 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping Fri 25/10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Into Inverurie Works for cutting up, 25/10/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 18/01/1938
GOR Gorton 01/10/1938
DON Doncaster 26/01/1940
STM St Margarets 13/10/1945
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 27/01/1947
64B Haymarket 01/01/1959
64A St Margarets 10/11/1959
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 27/01/1947
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 17/01/1959
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 21/11/1959
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/01/1938 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2927)
03/03/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3014)
22/02/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3302)
12/11/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3000)
08/03/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29530)
23/04/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29444)
23/02/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29441)
08/01/1959 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
20/10/1960 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
20/10/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29367)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 14/05/1938 18/05/1938 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 25/02/1939 08/07/1939 134 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/02/1941 15/03/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/04/1943 26/06/1943 71 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/01/1945 03/03/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 27/12/1946 22/02/1947 58 days General
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 109)
 
Cowlairs Works 10/01/1948 17/01/1948 8 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 02/10/1948 12/11/1948 42 days General
Boiler number 3000 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60827
 
Darlington Works 01/03/1950 06/04/1950 37 days Light Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 14/12/1951 15/12/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/02/1952 08/03/1952 33 days General
Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109)
 
Inverurie Works 12/11/1952 14/11/1952 3 days Light Casual
Tender only
 
Darlington Works 28/09/1953 31/10/1953 34 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 02/11/1953 04/11/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 31/03/1955 23/04/1955 24 days General
Boiler number 29444 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 25/04/1955 11/05/1955 17 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/05/1955 17/05/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 11/07/1955 14/07/1955 4 days Unclassified
New set of superheater elements
 
Darlington Works 22/01/1957 23/02/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 25/02/1957 26/02/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/08/1957 15/10/1957 48 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 26/11/1958 08/01/1959 44 days Heavy Intermediate
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 06/09/1960 20/10/1960 45 days General
Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109)
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 04/11/1960 08/11/1960 5 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/01/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 4798
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
14/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 18/05/1938.    
01/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939.    
26/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941.    
17/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.    
20/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 109)
   
13/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 727 but not taken up    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 827    
27/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 22/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 109)
   
27/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
10/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 17/01/1948.    
02/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 12/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3000 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60827
   
01/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/03/1950. Dep: 06/04/1950.    
14/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951.    
05/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109)
   
12/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
28/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/09/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.    
02/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 04/11/1953.    
31/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29444 (Diagram 109)
   
25/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 11/05/1955.    
16/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1955. Dep: 17/05/1955.    
11/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 14/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
New set of superheater elements
   
22/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109)
   
25/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1957. Dep: 26/02/1957.    
29/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1957. Dep: 15/10/1957.    
26/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/11/1958. Dep: 08/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
01/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
10/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
06/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1960. Dep: 20/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109)
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
04/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1960. Dep: 08/11/1960.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60827 from St Margarets (64A)    
25/10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev