|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/05/1938 | 19/05/1938 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1939 | 11/01/1940 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1942 | 13/08/1942 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1944 | 03/08/1944 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2978 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 51 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 830 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1947 | 25/02/1947 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1949 | 11/03/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2923 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60830 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1951 | 19/09/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29375 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1954 | 08/03/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1956 | 21/02/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29395 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1958 | 31/03/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29535 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1958 | 10/07/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1958 | 28/11/1958 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1959 | 29/05/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1961 | 26/05/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28085 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/04/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4801 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1743 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
16/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1938. Dep: 19/05/1938. | ||
26/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1939. Dep: 11/01/1940. | ||
10/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1942. Dep: 13/08/1942. | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
11/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1944. Dep: 03/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2978 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 730 but not taken up | ||
20/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 830 |
||
24/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1947. Dep: 25/02/1947. | ||
31/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1949. Dep: 11/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2923 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60830 |
||
19/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
11/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1951. Dep: 19/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29375 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
05/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1954. Dep: 08/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1956. Dep: 21/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29395 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1958. Dep: 31/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29535 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1958. Dep: 10/07/1958. | ||
23/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/10/1958. Dep: 28/11/1958. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
27/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1959. Dep: 29/05/1959. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
21/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1961. Dep: 26/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28085 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60830 from Grantham (34F) | ||
21/08/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |