|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/07/1938 | 16/08/1938 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1939 | 29/04/1939 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1939 | 16/12/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1941 | 25/01/1941 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/11/1941 | 22/11/1941 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2898 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1948 | 30/11/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9170 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60831 |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1950 | 29/12/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1951 | 07/09/1951 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1953 | 19/02/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1955 | 25/03/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29360 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1956 | 30/11/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1957 | 15/06/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29514 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29388 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1961 | 29/04/1961 | 12 days | Light Casual | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1961 | 11/01/1962 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1957 | Leicester (G.C.) MPD | This shed is expected to close and the work shared between Neasden and Darnall (41A). At start of winter time tables the A3's (60049/102/4/6/7/11) were exchanged for V2's 60831/42/54/63/911. This leaves no A3's on the G.C. at all. A5 69800 has replaced L1 67786. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/05/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4802 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1754 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
22/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1938. Dep: 16/08/1938. | ||
30/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. | ||
24/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. | ||
18/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939. | ||
04/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941. | ||
16/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. | ||
19/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941. | ||
17/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. | ||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2898 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 731 but not taken up | ||
26/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 831 | ||
14/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. | ||
14/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1948. Dep: 30/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9170 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60831 |
||
19/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
27/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1950. Dep: 29/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1951. Dep: 07/09/1951. | ||
19/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1953. Dep: 19/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
28/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
24/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29360 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1956. Dep: 30/11/1956. | ||
10/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1957. Dep: 15/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29514 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
01/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
01/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29388 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
18/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1961. Dep: 29/04/1961. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
04/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1961. Dep: 11/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
06/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60831 from York (North) (50A) | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |